This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:00:04 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jerry Lee Wells

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jerry Lee Wells. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary, Penner, Don, Cardoza, Jane and Sanderson, Houry. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8863

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Penner, Don

Cardoza, Jane

Sanderson, Houry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Wells, Jerry Lee

Wells, Jerry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Sanderson, Houry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal In Light of Plea in Case F18903882 Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: J. Cline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. Freitas Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Sanderson, Houry; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Trail 1 day Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. Carasso Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 1:45 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: E0353765

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less