This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 14:18:21 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jeremy Scott Reyes

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jeremy Scott Reyes. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nunez, Ralph and de Alba, Ana. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9184

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nunez, Ralph

de Alba, Ana

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Reyes, Jeremy Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • Disposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 06/15/2019; ; $250.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: de Alba, Ana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: de Alba, Ana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • $4.00 EMAT Fee pursuant to AB 2173 to the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs. to GC70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Court Operations Fee purs. to PC 1465.8 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Fine Imposed- Comment: Amount: $171.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Total Amount of Fines and Fees Due- Comment: Amount: $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $500.00 Conditions: Night Service -No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 4:24 PM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 4:24 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: E0355783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial info for Reyes, Jeremy Scott: Transaction Assessment $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Financial: Reyes, Jeremy Scott; Total Financial Assessment $250.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.