This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:06:13 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jason Robert Harris

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jason Robert Harris. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kapetan, Jon, Whitehead, Denise and Penner, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9137

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kapetan, Jon

Whitehead, Denise

Penner, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Harris, Jason Robert

Harris, Jason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Penner, Don

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Minute Order Corrected/Amended- Comment: 1st Corrected for hearing 12/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Order to prohibit the use of a firearm- Comment: Reported to the DOJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • CLETS received from FSO Transportation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Police Reports received from the District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • The Court Orders the Clerk's Office to notify the Elections- Comment: Office of disqualification of voting rights pursuant to EC 2211.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Transportation Order- Comment: Fresno County Sheriff's Department is ordered to transport Defendant to: The State Department of State Hospital

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Defendant remanded into custody- Comment: Bail Set at No Bail. Amount: $0.00. Convicted: No

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Warrant Abstract Filed- Comment: Issue Date: 6/18/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2256462

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type:AW Amount: $5,000 Conditions: no

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Kapetan, Jon; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Complaint Filed at Counter - No Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.