This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:07:36 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jamar Akeem Ables

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Jamar Akeem Ables. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary, Gottlieb, David, Gallagher, John and Kelley, James A, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8821

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Gottlieb, David

Gallagher, John

Kelley, James A, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Ables, Jamar Akeem

Ables, Jarmar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Schweitzer, Eric

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: Liz Owen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Special appearance by Attorney- Comment: Attorney: Robert Angres For Attorney: Eric Schweitzer Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Kelley, James A, JR; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 32 - Blotter Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Jail Release Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Warrant Abstract Filed- Comment: Issue Date: 6/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type:Arrest Amount: $500 Conditions:None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gottlieb, David; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Complaint Filed at Counter - No Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less