Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 16:56:50 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Jaime Fonseca

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 a Other case was filed by The People of the State of California against Jaime Fonseca in the jurisdiction of Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6691

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Fonseca, Jaime

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Disposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 05/15/2019; ; $1,394.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,444.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 04/10/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/09/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; Comment: Within 60 days or file DMV exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Fee Totals ; Due: 05/15/2019; ; $1,394.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,444.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 04/10/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 04/10/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; Comment: Within 60 days or file DMV exemption

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Green, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Green, Gary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Document Mailed- Comment: Document:Misdemeanor Notice and Order of Revocation of Probation Recipient: Jaime Fonseca Address: 110 W. Adell Apt. 214 Madera, CA 93638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type: Probation Violation Warrant Amount: $500.00 Conditions: Night Service-No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Court finds- Comment: Finding:that there is reasonable cause to believe that the defendant is in violation of the terms and conditions of their probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Order Signed and Filed- Judicial Officer: Green, Gary; Comment: Order:Misdemeanor Notice and Order of Revocation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Chambers Work- Post- Judicial Officer: Green, Gary; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: R. Allein

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. Lassen Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:55 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: 2287180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial info for Fonseca, Jaime: Transaction Assessment $1444.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Financial: Fonseca, Jaime; Total Financial Assessment $1,444.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less