This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 12:46:19 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Isaac Jimenez

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Isaac Jimenez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9066

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Jimenez, Isaac

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Amend Reason: Conditional Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Withdraw plea- Comment: Defendant's motion to withdraw plea granted. Plea: Nolo Count(s): 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People. Type of Motion: Dismissal of case. Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: R. Shirzad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: C. Chang Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:18 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • District Attorney Letter Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:District Police Department Citation #:022329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less