This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 05:40:05 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Heriberto Eddie Marquez

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Heriberto Eddie Marquez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Nunez, Ralph and Allen-Hill, Glenda. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8851

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Nunez, Ralph

Allen-Hill, Glenda

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Marquez, Heriberto

Marquez, Heriberto Eddie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 64 Actual: 32 GTWT: 32 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: Today); Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 06/26/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 64 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Allen-Hill, Glenda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Defendant released on Credit For Time Served- Comment: This case only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Criminal Protective Order Terminated in open court- Comment: Date of Order: 5/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Payment extended- Comment: Date: Within 30 days of release.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs.to GC 70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Court Operations Fee purs. to PC 1465.8 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:11 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Criminal Protective Order Issued in CCPOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial info for Marquez, Heriberto Eddie: Transaction Assessment $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Financial: Marquez, Heriberto Eddie; Total Financial Assessment $220.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less