This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/10/2019 at 14:18:29 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Francisco Javier Diaz

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Francisco Javier Diaz. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Hoff, Gary, Peterson, Dennis, Idiart, Michael, Ellison, Wayne and Zepeda, Francine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8856

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Hoff, Gary

Peterson, Dennis

Idiart, Michael

Ellison, Wayne

Zepeda, Francine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Diaz, Francisco Javier

Mancha, Francisco Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order, Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod, Probation Terminated Early; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 225 Actual: 113 GTWT: 112 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 10/15/19); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/01/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 10/15/2019; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 180 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total:120 Actual:60 GTWT:60 Treatment:0 Tentative Release Date: 07/24/2019); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/24/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 07/09/2019; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 150 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 101 Actual: 51 GTWT: 50 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/19/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/06/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 12/19/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 101 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 101 Actual: 51 GTWT: 50 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/19/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/04/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 12/19/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 101 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 44 Actual: 22 GTWT: 22 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 09/23/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 09/02/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 90 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 44 Actual: 22 GTWT: 22 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 09/23/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/30/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 08/31/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 90 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
166 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time: 9:45 am Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:45 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Hearing - Missing Complaint- Judicial Officer: Hoff, Gary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Per District Attorney defendant may be eligible for Prop 63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case has been designated a Domestic Violence filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Surety Bond Posted- Comment: Bond Number:3004-111303993

    Read MoreRead Less