This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 11:58:53 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Fernando Manuel Mora

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Fernando Manuel Mora. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chittick, Hilary. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8871

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chittick, Hilary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Mora , Fernando Manuel

Mora, Fernando

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation- Comment: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal in light of plea in M18920013 Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: T. Kelly Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:12 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Trail 1 day Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: T. Kelly Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:44am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Selma Police Department Citation #:153482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less