This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/24/2019 at 14:06:24 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Elizabeth Kay Padilla

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Elizabeth Kay Padilla. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cullers, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8858

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cullers, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Padilla, Elizabeth Kay

Ojeda, Elizabeth K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Alternate Defense Office

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 1 Actual: 1 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0); Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 10/30/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 10/30/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 5 Days; Suspended: 4 Days; Suspended Reason: On the condition defendant complies with Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Payment extended- Comment: Date: 01-28-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs.to GC 70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Court Operations Fee purs. to PC 1465.8 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Attorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Alternate Defense Office Reason: Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:36 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency:Clovis Police Department Citation #: 2018022418435723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Financial info for Padilla, Elizabeth Kay: Counter Payment Receipt # TR-2018-00061689 Padilla, Elizabeth Kay $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Financial info for Padilla, Elizabeth Kay: Transaction Assessment $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Financial: Padilla, Elizabeth Kay; Total Financial Assessment $220.00; Total Payments and Credits $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less