This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:37:34 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Eduardo David Olivera

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Eduardo David Olivera. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hamlin, W Kent, Whitehead, Denise and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8869

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hamlin, W Kent

Whitehead, Denise

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Olivera, Eduardo David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Neal, Glen T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Olivera, Eduardo David: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2020-08239 Olivera, Eduardo D $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWeb Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2020-08239 Confirmation #:397946 Amount paid: $105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Olivera, Eduardo David: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-85292 Olivera, Eduardo D $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketWeb Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2019-85292 Confirmation #:373038 Amount paid: $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for Olivera, Eduardo David: Web Payment Receipt # WEB-2019-72938 Olivera, Eduardo D $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketWeb Payment Reviewed and Confirmed- Comment: Receipt #:WEB-2019-72938 Confirmation #:361367 Amount paid: $35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketDefendant failed to complete:- Comment: DECISIONS FOR LIFE 8/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCourt Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: Program: DECISIONS FOR LIFE 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketJUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 09/01/2019; ; $803.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $853.00; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 06/20/2019; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 06/19/2022; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 90 Days; Stayed: 90 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCopy of charging document received by Defendant- Comment: Document: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDefendant's presence waived pursuant to PC 977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDistrict Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: K Rigby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketPrivate Counsel appearing on behalf of the Defendant- Comment: Attorney: G Neal Defendant present: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketAttorney of Record set- Comment: Attorney: Glenn Neil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketProceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:22 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketArraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCase Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCitation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno Police Department Citation #: E0353290

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketCharging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less