This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:04:57 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Dominique Renee Bustamante

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Dominique Renee Bustamante. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Peterson, Dennis, Cabrera, Carlos, Orozco, Gary, Harrell, Alvin M, III, Whitehead, Denise and Corona, Adolfo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9159

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Peterson, Dennis

Cabrera, Carlos

Orozco, Gary

Harrell, Alvin M, III

Whitehead, Denise

Corona, Adolfo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Bustamante, Dominique Renee

Saiz, Julian Victor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 308 Actual: 154 GTWT: 154 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 12/10/2018); Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 308 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Corona, Adolfo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Court orders Probation denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Defendant released on Credit For Time Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Jail Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Defendant advised pursuant to VC 23593(a)- Comment: Pursuant to VC 23593(a), Murder Advisement read and initialed by Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Defendant is sentenced forthwith

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant waived statutory time- Comment: Hearing Type: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Trail to Monday 06/11/2018 - Probation to file Violation on F18901106 Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: I. Aliyev

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: S. Bullock Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept 95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • District Attorney Letter Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.