This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 05:43:07 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. David Larry Mestas

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against David Larry Mestas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8864

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Mestas, David Larry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Elliott, Kirk W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Fee Totals ; Due: 09/05/2018; ; $1,895.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $1,945.00; Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 07/24/2018; Comment: within 30 days; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 07/24/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 07/23/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 180 Days; Suspended: 165 Days; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Court Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: CS 200 HRS. BY 11/26/18 SENTENCING ALTERNATIVES PROGRAM INC. COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Document filed- Comment: Document: Notification from Sentencing Alternatives Program, Inc. of completion of community service hours

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Correspondence filed- Comment: Letter from Attorney regarding defendant's completion of community service hours

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Incoming/Outgoing Fax- Comment: From: Attorney Kirk Elliott forwarding Sentencing Alternatives Program Inc Regarding: Completion of 200 hours of community service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Copy Provided To:- Comment: For Atty MO 7/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Court orders Adult Offender Work Program converted- Comment: to Community Service. 200 hours to be completed by 11/26/18, S.A.P in Santa Clara County

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Notice of possible probation violation- Comment: Pursuant to VC 23622(c) County: Santa Clara County Sent: 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Prosecution indicates defendant has prior DUI conviction(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: California Highway Patrol Citation #: 19357

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial info for Mestas, David Larry: Transaction Assessment $1945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Financial: Mestas, David Larry; Total Financial Assessment $1,945.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less