This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 17:18:42 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Dale Eldridge Ratliff

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Dale Eldridge Ratliff. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary and Penner, Don. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0290

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Penner, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Ratliff, Dale Eldridge

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismissal Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: T. Eilers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: T. Kelly Defendant Present: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:34 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 11 Add on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Defendant Arrested, Abstract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Warrant Issued- Comment: Type:Arrest Amount: $1,000 Conditions:None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant reviewed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Penner, Don; Hearing Time: 6:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Department 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Complaint Filed at Counter - No Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less