This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/21/2019 at 05:52:21 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Bryce Jacob Voorhees

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Bryce Jacob Voorhees. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chittick, Hilary and Whitehead, Denise. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8883

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chittick, Hilary

Whitehead, Denise

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Voorhees, Bryce Jacob

Voorchees, Bryce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Pre-Trial- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Department 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Teletype Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Clovis Police Department Citation #: 2018122417575761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Teletype Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Warrant Abstract Filed- Comment: Issue Date: 12/3/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Warrant Activated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Warrant Ordered Issued- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $10,000.00 Conditions: Night Service - No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Court orders Defendant Cite status revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • Warrant Held- Comment: Type: Bench Warrant Amount: $500.00 Held to: 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Previously set calendar date remains- Comment: Arraignment on 08/06/2018 at 8:30 am in Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Defendant is not present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 11:00 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Chittick, Hilary; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Caifornia State University, Fresno PD Citation #: 10308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less