This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/03/2019 at 14:07:00 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Benjamin Junior Olivas

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Benjamin Junior Olivas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise and Peterson, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8771

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Peterson, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Olivas, Benjamin Jesus, JR

Olivas, Benjamin Junior

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Conditional Settlement - Sentencing- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Surety Bond Exoneration Notice Sent- Comment: Bond Number: IS50K-135900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Withdraw plea- Comment: Defendant's motion to withdraw plea granted. Plea: Not Guilty Count(s): 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Surety Bond Exonerated- Comment: Bond Number: IS50K-135900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Comply with all other Court Orders and Family Law/Civil- Comment: Protective Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Criminal Protective Order Remains- Comment: Date of Protective Order: 8/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Defendant Released on Own Recognizance

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • No Action Taken- Comment: Defendant bonded out

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Case having been called at- Comment: Time:10:42 AM Defendant not present.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Surety Bond Posted- Comment: Bond Number: IS50K-135900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Per District Attorney defendant may be eligible for Prop 63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case has been designated a Domestic Violence filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less