This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 05:25:29 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs Bedrosian Truck Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2015 The People of the State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Bedrosian Truck Service, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Cullers, Mark, Dalesandro, Samuel and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2634

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Cullers, Mark

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Bedrosian Truck Serivce Inc.

Grumbles, Albert E

Grumbles, Irma J

Tayian, Barry

Charlie's Enterpries, Inc.

Bedrosian, Peter H

Charlie's Enterprises

OK Produce

Bedrosian, George H

Antaramian, Charles

Antaramian, Nevart

Bedrosian, Rose

Bedrosian, Beatruce M

Bedrosian, Diane A

Bedrosian, George H, JR

Visa Petroleum

Sartoris Truck Repair

Bedrosian, Beatrice M

The Heirs and Devisees of Peter Bedrosian, deceased, and all persons claiming by and through, or under decedent

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bowman, Kirsten

Defendant Attorneys

Tristao, Craig A.

Forbes, Donald R.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Tayian, Barry; Comment: Without Prejudice.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: by Publication as to The Heirs and Devisees of Charles Antaramian, deceased, and all persons claiming by and through, or under decedent; The Heirs and Devisees of Peter Bedrosian, deceased, and all persons claiming by and through, or under decedent; The Heirs and Devisees of Nevart Antaramian, deceased, and all persons claiming by and through, or under decedent; and All Persons Unknown claiming an interest in the property

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Dalesandro

Application Filed

Application; Comment: Application to Amend Complaint to Substitute Heirs and Devisees of Nevart Antaramian in Place of Fictitious Defendant

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Notice Filed

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Comment: Acknowledgment of Receipt - DEFECTIVE - as to Bedrosian Truck Service - no name of entity on whose behalf this form is signed

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of case management conference

Request to Enter Default

Request to Enter Default

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed

Application for Publication/Posting Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: and granted Type of Document: Summons and Complaint by Publication in the Fresno Bee as to: All Persons unknown claiming an interest in the property

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Acknowledgment of Receipt - DEFECTIVE - as to Bedrosian Truck Service - no name of entity on whose behalf this form is signed

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Sartoris Truck Repair

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Confernce and Assignment of Civil Judge for All Purposes

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (As to Ok Produce ONLY. Charlie's enterprises, Inc. was previously dismissed on 1-4-16.); Party Name: OK Produce; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Tayian, Barry; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Charlie's Enterpries, Inc.; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Grumbles, Albert E; Grumbles, Irma J; Comment: Without Prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Pre- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:32 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Bedrosian Truck Serivce Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-36180 Bedrosian Truck Serivce Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial info for Bedrosian Truck Serivce Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Financial: Bedrosian Truck Serivce Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Transaction Assessment $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00000743 The People of the State of California $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Financial: The People of the State of California; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.