This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/20/2019 at 06:24:32 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Anthony Noel Segura

Case Summary

On 05/30/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Anthony Noel Segura. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cullers, Mark, Peterson, Dennis, Ellison, Wayne, Gottlieb, David and Hoff, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8783

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cullers, Mark

Peterson, Dennis

Ellison, Wayne

Gottlieb, David

Hoff, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Segura, Anthony Noel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Public Defender

Alternate Defense Office

Beshwate, Richard Wheel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod; Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 08/17/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 11/02/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 220 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Probation Violated, Revoked, and/or Reinstated With Sent Mod; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 220 Actual: 110 GTWT: 110 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: Today); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 08/17/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 11/02/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 220 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 06/27/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Concurrent: Concurrent to Count 001; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Suspended: 164 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Disposition: Amended Amended Sentence- Amend Reason: Court Order; Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 64 Actual: 32 GTWT: 32 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 09/04/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 06/27/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Suspended: 164 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 06/27/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Concurrent: Concurrent to Count 001; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Suspended: 164 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 64 Actual: 32 GTWT: 32 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 09/04/2018); Probation; Type: Formal Probation; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term: 5 Years; End Date: 06/27/2023; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 06/28/2018; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 364 Days; Suspended: 164 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2018
  • Courtesy Notice - Failure to Pay Warning Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Clerk's Office sends JUS 8715 subsequent to D.O.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
149 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • Criminal Protective Order Issued in CCPOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: Dept. 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Case has been designated a Domestic Violence filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Per District Attorney defendant may be eligible for Prop 63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Financial info for Segura, Anthony Noel: Transaction Assessment $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Financial: Segura, Anthony Noel; Total Financial Assessment $140.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less