Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 15:20:22 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Anthony Amezcua

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Anthony Amezcua. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Vogt, John and Nunez, Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0111

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Vogt, John

Nunez, Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Amezcua, Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Public Defender

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Vogt, John

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Defendant released on this case only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Defendant Released on all Counts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: People Type of Motion: Dismiss Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: A. Janz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: A. Armendariz Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Vogt, John; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • Motion- Comment: Submitting Party: Defense Type of Motion: Continuance Oral/Written: Oral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • District Attorney appearing on behalf of the People- Comment: Deputy District Attorney: R. Shirzad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Public Defender appearing with Defendant- Comment: Deputy Public Defender: J. Newcomb Defendant Present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Court appoints Public Defender to represent Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:41 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Nunez, Ralph; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued at Request of Defense; Comment: D97B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less