This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 13:56:49 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Angelo Joseph Boo Boo Torres

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Angelo Joseph Boo Boo Torres. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Whitehead, Denise, Gottlieb, David and Cabrera, Carlos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9525

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Whitehead, Denise

Gottlieb, David

Cabrera, Carlos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendants

Torres, Angelo Joseph

Torres, Angelo Joseph Boo Boo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Defender, Public

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 1 Actual: 1 GTWT: 0 Treatment: 0); Fee Totals ; Due: 10/01/2018; ; $2,250.00 ; ; ; $50.00 ; ; Fee Totals; $2,300.00; Programs; Attend and Complete (SB38) 18 Month Alcohol Program; Ordered; Order Date: 08/23/2018; Comment: Within 30 days; Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 08/23/2018; Term: 3 Years; End Date: 08/22/2021; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Start Date: 10/19/2018; Start Time: 6:45 PM; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 15 Days; Suspended: 0 Day; Suspended Reason: Referred to Adult Offender Work Program; DL Conditions; Type: Findings, Orders and Information; BAC/Drugs: Alcohol; BAC Level: 0.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Cabrera, Carlos

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Proof of Program filed- Comment: ENROLLED ON 9/5/18 Program: 18 MOP DUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Court Orders Clerk's Office to refer defendant to- Comment: Program: 18 months DUI prgm - KV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Court orders Alcohol Assessment Program fee purs to VC 23649- Comment: Amount: $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • $4.00 EMAT Fee pursuant to AB 2173 to the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Criminal Conviction Fee purs.to GC 70373 to the Court- Comment: Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 10:12 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Whitehead, Denise; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: D13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Amendment to Citation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Fingerprint on Back of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Citation Filed- Comment: Citing Agency: Fresno County Detention Facility Citation #: S109957

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Financial info for Torres, Angelo Joseph Boo Boo: Transaction Assessment $2300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Financial: Torres, Angelo Joseph Boo Boo; Total Financial Assessment $2,300.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less