This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:03:39 (UTC).

The People of the State of California vs. Adrian Michael Cerkueira

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Adrian Michael Cerkueira. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Peterson, Dennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9084

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fresno Superior Courthouse Downtown

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Peterson, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California

Defendant

Cerkueira, Adrian Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ciummo & Associates

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Sentence- Comment: (The Defendant's TIME CREDITS are as follows: Total: 10 Actual: 5 GTWT: 5 Treatment: 0 Tentative Release Date: 06/06/2018); Probation; Type: Conditional Sentence; Start Date: 06/06/2018; Term: 2 Years; End Date: 06/06/2020; Imposition of Sentence Suspended; Status; Adult Confinement; Type: Fresno County Jail; Facility: Fresno County Jail; Term Type: Incarcerated; Term: 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Disposition- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Disposition: Plea- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DMV Non-Reportable Violation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Probation Revocation Advisement pursuant to PC 1202.44- Comment: Amount: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Defendant Released on Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Fines/Fees suspended as to count(s)- Comment: Fine amount: $220.00 Count(s): 001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Jail Imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Conditional Probation imposed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2018
  • Ciummo and Associates appearing on behalf of Defendant- Comment: Attorney: T Cox Defendant present: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Attorney conflict; new counsel appointed- Comment: It appearing there is an attorney conflict. New counsel is appointed. Attorney appointed: Ciummo and Associates Reason: Conflict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Proceedings recorded electronically at- Comment: Time: 9:41 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Arraignment- Judicial Officer: Peterson, Dennis; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dept. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Case Initiation Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • JUS 8715- Comment: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Defendant in Custody- Comment: Defendant is in custody at the Fresno County Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Charging Document - Formal Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial info for Cerkueira, Adrian Michael: Transaction Assessment $220.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Financial: Cerkueira, Adrian Michael; Total Financial Assessment $0.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.