This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 11:46:47 (UTC).

The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation vs.Nineda, L.P. A California Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 05/06/2016 The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Nineda, L P A California Limited Partnership. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1473

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation

Defendants

Ullom, Ralph Michael

Fresno Irrigation District

Fresno Metropolitan Flood Control District

City of Fresno

Nineda, LTD

Nineda, L.P. A California Limited Partnership

Derrel's Mini Storage, Inc

Ullom, Susan

Doe 22

Doe 17

Doe 19

Brar, Harinder Singh

Scott, Stewart

Robinson, Lindsay

Woods, Terrill

Cagle, Thomas

Doe 37

Doe 15

Rivera, Teresa

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sims, W Christopher

Defendant Attorney

Brewer, Charles W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Vega, Robert; OSCC Outdoor Sports Coalition of CA; Comment: Without Prejudice

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: DECLARATION OF BRENDA MCKENZIE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER OF POSSESSION OF PARCELS 86951-1B, 86951-2, 86951-4, AND 86951-5

Request Filed

Request for Evidentiary Hearing; Comment: Request for Evidentiary Hearing

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Declaration Filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: Of Brenda McKenzie in support of motion for order of possession

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Deposit and Summary of the Basis for the Appraisal

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Dick, Demetrion; Robinson, Lindsay; Woods, Terrill; Comment: WIthout Prejudice

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF GARTH FERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF POSSESSION OF PARCELS 86951-1B, 86951-2, 86951-4, AND 86951-5

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default; Comment: Without judgment

ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed

Stipulation; Comment: ***Case IS NOW at Issue*** Not signed by: Susan Ullom, Ralph Ullom, Jorge Rodriguez Party(s) who signed: W. Christopher Sims, Wesley Hansen ADR method chosen: Mediation

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: John Sandoval

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Disclaimer of interest

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

133 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Rodriguez, Jorge H.; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Gulley, Joe; Pierre, Phillip; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: McCaskill, Rose; Molina, Gustavo; Barrie, Marc; Klein, Gary; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Lomeli, Trinidad; Uribe, Irene; Smiley, Patrick; Kennedy, Joshua; Comment: WIthout Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Dick, Demetrion; Robinson, Lindsay; Woods, Terrill; Comment: WIthout Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Puente, Paul; Wallace, Adrianne; Gonzales, Cheryl; Sandoval, John; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Ahumadaaubet, Beethoven; Babcock, Linda; Franklin, Darryl; Comment: WIthout Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Ramirez, Diane; Harley, Colleen; Scott, Stewart; Comment: WIthout Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Rodriguez, Edward; Cagle, Thomas; Brar, Harinder Singh; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Vega, Robert; OSCC Outdoor Sports Coalition of CA; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
193 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Government Exemption Claimed $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Government Exemption Claimed $53.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $53.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00020156 John Chiang $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Financial info for The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Financial: The People of the State of California, Department of Transportation; Total Financial Assessment $403.00; Total Payments and Credits $403.00

    Read MoreRead Less