This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 09:04:54 (UTC).

The Golden 1 Credit Union vs Barbara Bixman/DIS

Case Summary

On 02/23/2012 The Golden 1 Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Barbara Bixman/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0259

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Golden 1 Credit Union

Defendant

Bixman, Barbara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Barry A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Bankruptcy Documents Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • Case Restored to Court's Control

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal of entire action of all parties and all causes of action filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. mn Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Bankruptcy documents filed- Comment: Bankruptcy documents filed. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Filed proof service by mail- Comment: Copies of Sumons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Validation Notice were mailed to Barbara Bixman on 4/10/12 with First Class postage fully prepaid in the United States Mail. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Diligence filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Bill Bixman, Co-Occupant on 4/9/12, mailed on 4/10/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$370.00 was made on receipt CLCL38177.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . cg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: cg Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial info for The Golden 1 Credit Union: Counter Payment Receipt # 38177 The Golden 1 Credit Union $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial info for The Golden 1 Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial info for The Golden 1 Credit Union: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Financial: The Golden 1 Credit Union; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less