This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:15:50 (UTC).

The Best Service Co vs. Alfredo Cardenas

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 The Best Service Co filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alfredo Cardenas. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gamoian, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2106

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gamoian, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Best Service Co. Inc.

Defendants

Cardenas, Alfredo

Roman, Jose B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garen, Clark

6700 S. Centinela Ave., 3Rd Fl

Culver City, CA 90230

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Interest

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: C.C.P. 585 (d)

Judgment

Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: The Best Service Co. Inc.; Cardenas, Alfredo; Roman, Jose B.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; The Best Service Co. Inc.; Awarded Against:; Cardenas, Alfredo; Roman, Jose B.; Amount; Damages: $4,107.65; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 6.89 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,070.81; Attorney Fees: $821.53; Costs: $367.50; Total: $6367.49

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: C.C.P. 1033(b)

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6392.49

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously entered on 3/14/14

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

Order Granted

Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig.

Request for Court Judgment

Request for Court Judgment; Comment: "Forwarded to.' 404

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: The Best Service Co. Inc.; Cardenas, Alfredo; Roman, Jose B.; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; The Best Service Co. Inc.; Awarded Against:; Cardenas, Alfredo; Roman, Jose B.; Amount; Damages: $4,107.65; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 6.89 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,070.81; Attorney Fees: $821.53; Costs: $367.50; Total: $6367.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed, wholly unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 6392.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granted- Order Granted; Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Comment: Copies in Lieu of Orig.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept:404 on 12/28/15 Order for: Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Court Judgment- Request for Court Judgment; Comment: "Forwarded to.' 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Previously entered on 3/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration Filed; Comment: C.C.P. 585 (d)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - lmi Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00007159 The Best Service Co. Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00007157 The Best Service Co. Inc. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # 325478 The Best Service Co. Inc. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial info for The Best Service Co. Inc.: Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Financial: The Best Service Co. Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $275.00; Total Payments and Credits $275.00

    Read MoreRead Less