This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:20:15 (UTC).

Teresita Borges vs Ausuncio Gonzales/DIS

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Teresita Borges filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ausuncio Gonzales/DIS. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Black, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3897

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Borges, Teresita

Defendants

Gonzales Jr., Ausuncio

Gonzales, Ausuncio, JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dunnion, Connell

2711 Garden Road

Monterey, CA 93940

Defendant Attorney

Hartman, Chiquita

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conditional Settlement Reached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Original Type: CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for 225 hearing scheduled for 8-18-14. Dismissed gar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed with prejudice. gar Event: Dismissal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 09-APR-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Notice of CRC 225 Hrng Printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 09-APR-2014 by CPRENDERGAST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off Calendar for CMC scheduled for 04/21/2014. Notice of settlement of entire case filed. Dismissal hearing set for 08/18/2014 at 1:00pm in Room 104 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • Conditional Settlement Reached- Comment: Conditional settlement reached and filed as to entire case. Projected completion date: 06/25/2014 csp

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: sg Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet sg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial info for Gonzales, Ausuncio, JR: Counter Payment Receipt # 186966 Gonzales, Ausuncio, Jr $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial info for Gonzales, Ausuncio, JR: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Financial: Gonzales, Ausuncio, JR; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Borges, Teresita: Counter Payment Receipt # 185362 Borges, Teresita $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial info for Borges, Teresita: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • Financial: Borges, Teresita; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less