This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:19:46 (UTC).

Teresa Sandoval vs.Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC/CLASS ACTION

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 Teresa Sandoval filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Organic Pastures Dairy Co , LLC/CLASS ACTION. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Diaz, Monica, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Gaab, Kimberly and Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1771

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Diaz, Monica

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Gaab, Kimberly

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandoval, Teresa

Defendant

Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Moss, Ari E.

Selik, Evan M

Defendant Attorney

Cortez, Laurie M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

1807050_72511.16.17-; Comment: Notice of Submission of Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Civil Judge for All Purposes

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 hearing set for 7/18/19 at 3:30 pm in dept. 402

Notice of Settlement filed

Ntc of settlement.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

Statement filed

SKM_C36818112715120.pdf; Comment: Defendants Arbitration Status Conference Report (Hrg: 11/29/18)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from chambers and Certificate of Mailing

Notice Filed

NTC.pdf; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of Arbitration Status Conference on 10/17/2018 at 3:30 PM in Deparment 503

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Sandoval, Teresa; Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • CRC 3.1385 After Settlement- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 3:31 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- DISMISSAL.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 hearing set for 7/18/19 at 3:30 pm in dept. 402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Ntc of settlement.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:28 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: from Chambers and Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Document filed- SKM_C36819012915180.pdf; Comment: Joint Arbitration Status Report (Hrg: 1/30/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Case Management Conference and Assignment of Civil Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Financial info for Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-24363 Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Financial info for Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Financial: Organic Pastures Dairy Co., LLC; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Sandoval, Teresa: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-26878 Sandoval, Teresa $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial info for Sandoval, Teresa: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Financial: Sandoval, Teresa; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORGANIC PASTURES DAIRY COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELIK EVAN MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS ARI E.