This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 09:56:46 (UTC).

Target National Bank vs. Janice L. Anderson/JU

Case Summary

On 01/31/2012 Target National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Janice L Anderson/JU. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target National Bank

Defendant

Anderson, Janice L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boulanger, Michael R.

 

Court Documents

Return filed

Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Return filed- Return filed; Comment: Return of Writ of Execution Filed wholly unsatisfied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • Satisfaction of judgment-full- Comment: Acknowledgement of full satisfaction of judgment filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE300715.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Memo of costs after judgment- Comment: Memorandum of costs after judgment, acknowledgement of credits and declaration of accrued interest filed. Credit: $0 Interest: $436.45 Costs: $0 lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Fresno in the amount of $5769.42 . lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE299761.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 04/30/12 for plaintiff(s) Target National Bank against defendant(s) Janice L. Anderson in the sum of: Principal: $5,064.47 Interest: $ 0.00 Atty Fees: $ 0.00 Costs: $ 243.50 Total: $5,307.97 jy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Request for Dismissal of Does- Comment: Request for dismissal of doe defendants 1 through 15 filed and dismissal entered without prejudice. jy

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration Under Business and Professions Code Section 6322.1 filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration RE: Venue filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$181.00 was made on receipt CLCL37822.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed, reduced filing fee. lmi Event: Comp filed reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Financial info for Target National Bank: Counter Payment Receipt # 37822 Target National Bank $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Financial info for Target National Bank: Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Financial: Target National Bank; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less