This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 12:25:35 (UTC).

Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation vs. Sean Stevens

Case Summary

On 03/08/2018 Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Sean Stevens. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Snauffer, Mark, Gaab, Kimberly, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y., Diaz, Monica and McGuire, Rosemary. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0814

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Snauffer, Mark

Gaab, Kimberly

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Diaz, Monica

McGuire, Rosemary

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation

Defendants

Stevens, Sean

Olson & Associates, a California business

Reform California, a California 527 Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McDowell, David F.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

TargetPOS.pdf; Comment: re: Temporary Restraining Order order

Order Granted

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: preliminary injunction

Summons issued and filed

Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal.pdf; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Request for Default Received

Request for Entry of Default.pdf; Comment: Without Judgment

Declaration Filed

Declaration of William Herbert Regarding Notice; Comment: of William Herbert Regarding Notice

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Cover Sheet.pdf

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint.pdf

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached certificate of mailing

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party Names: Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation; Stevens, Sean; Reform California, a California 527 Group; Olson & Associates, a California business; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation; Awarded Against:; Stevens, Sean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Olson & Associates, a California business; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Reform California, a California 527 Group; Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • 60-Day Continued OSC- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:31 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment; Comment: FTA CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- 2018-10-22 Proof of Service.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Notice of Assignment for Judge for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: McGuire, Rosemary; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Target - Proof of Service.pdf; Comment: re: REquest for Court Judgment and supporting documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Target - Proposed Judgment.pdf; Comment: Forward to Clerks Office on 10/16/18 for processing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Target - Declaration of W. Herbert.pdf; Comment: of William C. Herbert in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex parte Filed- Ex Parte Application For a Temporary Restraining Order and O; Comment: Ex Parte Application For a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Notice of CMC/CJAP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons.pdf; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Cover Sheet.pdf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Financial info for Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-20066 Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Financial info for Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • Financial info for Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2018-17670 Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • Financial info for Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • Financial: Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLSON & ASSOCIATES OF NW FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F