This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 23:34:48 (UTC).

Tamara Blevins vs.Dennys

Case Summary

On 08/01/2016 Tamara Blevins filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Dennys. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2472

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blevins, Tamara

McClung, Ashley

Defendants

Estrada, Roman

Dennys

D Jeffrey Rowland Living Trust

Rowland, Jeffrey

Dennys 8643

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bell, Jason S.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Blevins, Tamara; Dennys; McClung, Ashley; Dennys 8643; D Jeffrey Rowland Living Trust; Rowland, Jeffrey; Estrada, Roman; Comment: With Prejudice

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 3/6/17 at 1:00PM Rm #104

Notice of Settlement filed

Notice

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge Donald S. Black

Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified

Declaration; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Blevins, Tamara; Dennys; McClung, Ashley; Dennys 8643; D Jeffrey Rowland Living Trust; Rowland, Jeffrey; Estrada, Roman; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: 225 set for 3/6/17 at 1:00PM Rm #104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement filed- Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: Assignment of Judge Donald S. Black

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified- Declaration; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Complaint filed- Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Financial info for Blevins, Tamara: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-33114 Blevins, Tamara $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Financial info for Blevins, Tamara: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • Financial: Blevins, Tamara; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less