This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:30:07 (UTC).

Sylvia A Gonzalez vs Santiago V Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Sylvia A Gonzalez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Santiago. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6648

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Gonzalez, Sylvia Annette

Fresno, CA 93703

Respondent

Gonzalez, Santiago Verdugo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • Historical Documents- Comment: DMS Conversion Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Original Type: 1 Family - Centered Status Conference; Judicial Officer: Nystrom-Geist, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • Judgment Scanned FL Ret- Comment: Family Law Judgment Date: 01/22/2014 Scanned Date: 03/13/14 lml

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Respondent 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for CMC scheduled for 04-22-14 Judgment entered. 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: scanning shelf 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment filed. 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Fld judgmnt disso marr bfr hrg- Comment: Judgment granted/marital termination date 06-17-14 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Decl Serv Disc Inc & Expense- Comment: Preliminary and Final 01-22-14 rym

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Dissolution __x_ Legal Separation ___ 01-22-14 rym Event: Decl Default Uncontested Disso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • File forwarded- Comment: File requested and forwarded to: RM flex for judg review. nr 01-17-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • Proof of service filed- Comment: Proof of service of FL Marriage Petition and Response, Complete and Blank Declaration of Disclosure, Complete and Blank Schedule of Assets, Complete and Blank IED filed. Served on Respondent by personal service on 12/16/13 JJR 12/18/13 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MSOTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona ms 12/16/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Order Granting Waiver of Fees- Comment: Order signed Yes _X__ No ___ ms 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. ms 12/16/13 Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Income & Expense Declaration- Comment: ms 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes _X__ No ___ ms 12/16/13 Event: Pet Disso Mar-no child-No Fees

    Read MoreRead Less