This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 03:35:49 (UTC).

SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC vs John Janda

Case Summary

On 01/03/2013 SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against John Janda. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Smith, Bruce, Black, Donald and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Smith, Bruce

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bank of America, N.A.

SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC

Defendants

Janda, John P S

John P S Janda, M D , Inc

John P.S. Janda, M.D., Inc.

Janda, John P.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Voss, Matthew E.

Hemar, Rousso & Heald, Llp 15910 Ventura Blvd. 12Th Flr

Encino, CA 91436-2829

Defendant Attorney

Janda, John P.. S.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC; Judgment Amount: $1,064,663.81; Awarded Against:; John P.S. Janda, M.D., Inc.

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Janda, John P.S.; Comment: Without Prejudice.; Comment: (As to Defendant John P.S. Janda (all causes of action) As to John P.S. Janda M.D. Inc. (all causes of action EXCEPT No. 7, No. 8 and No. 10))

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 1,064,688.81 Premises Only

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of entry of judgment

Stipulation Filed

Stipulation Filed; Comment: Petition for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Order on Joint Ex Parte Application Pursuant to Stipulation to Amend The Complaint to Substitute Plaintiff - Granted. SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC substituted Bank of America as Plaitiff, all further documents shall reference in the body of the document SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC as Plaintiff.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: on joint ex parte to amend complaint

Ex parte Filed

Civil Document; Comment: Application pursuant to stipulation to amend the complaint to substitute plaintiff

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: RESCHEDULED FROM 2/12/16 TO 2/5/16 DUE TO COURT HOLIDAY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC; Judgment Amount: $1,064,663.81; Awarded Against:; John P.S. Janda, M.D., Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Janda, John P.S.; Comment: Without Prejudice.; Comment: (As to Defendant John P.S. Janda (all causes of action) As to John P.S. Janda M.D. Inc. (all causes of action EXCEPT No. 7, No. 8 and No. 10))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Comment: Amount: $1,064,663.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: 1,064,688.81 Premises Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued- Comment: Amount: $1,064,663.81

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept:502 Order for: Judgment Judgment signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing. Conformed copy mailed to counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation Filed; Comment: Petition for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
143 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2013
  • Financial info for SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • Financial: SummitBridge National Investments III, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $1,255.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Counter Payment Receipt # 195184 Janda, John P.S. $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Counter Payment Receipt # 176160 Janda, John P.S. $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Transaction Assessment $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Counter Payment Receipt # 175253 Janda, John P.S. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Counter Payment Receipt # 175521 Janda, John P.S. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Financial info for Janda, John P.S.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • Financial: Janda, John P.S.; Total Financial Assessment $540.00; Total Payments and Credits $540.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Peter J. Veiguela, Esq., #147529

Hemar, Rousso & Heald LLP 15910 Ventura Blvd., 12% Floor Encino, CA 91436 (808) 501-3800 Phone \E (808 )501-2985 Fax - 6 N -1 20 o S

David A. Roberts, #88723

Craig B. Fry, #210331 Rl 0 Langg, Richrgrt & Patch UPER\OR CQ(\\‘} OF FRE.SN = Post Office Box 40012 oY v

Fresno, California 93755-0012 (559) 228-6700 Phone

(559) 228-6727 Fax M:\35485\Pleadings\Jt. Ex parte appl. to amend complaint 1230.wpd

Attorneys for Real Party Plaintiff, SUMMITBRIDGE

NATIONAL INVESTMENTS III LLC SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA | —_—

== COUNTY OF FRESNO | ; =

=== * %% /7{ M | _—

s 3 = BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Case No. 13 CE CG 00007 M S T === -

Plaintiff,

JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION

V. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION TO

AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO ' SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF

JOHN P.S. JANDA aka JOHN P.S. JANDA, | M.D. an individual; JOHN P.S. JANDA, M.D., INC., a California corporation; ; and Trial date: February 17, 2016 0 _ )/ DOES 1-100, inclusive. - (9 (f Y

Defendants.

Comes now the plaintiff, Bank of America, NA, (B of A), by and through its attorneys of

record, Peter Veiguela of Hemar, Rousso & Heald, LLP, and the Real Party Plaintiff, SummitBridge

National Investments III, LL.C, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, (SummitBridge) and jointly apply to this Court, on an ex parte basis, for an order substituting SummitBridge National Investments I, LL.C as plaintiff in place and instead of Bank of America, NA, and state as follows