This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:56:03 (UTC).

Sue Robinson vs Color Spot Nurseries, Inc/COMPLEX

Case Summary

On 07/11/2016 Sue Robinson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Color Spot Nurseries, Inc/COMPLEX. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Culver Kapetan, Kristi, McGuire, Rosemary, Snauffer, Mark, Diaz, Monica, Cullers, Mark, Pebet, Noelle, Gaab, Kimberly and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2231

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

McGuire, Rosemary

Snauffer, Mark

Diaz, Monica

Cullers, Mark

Pebet, Noelle

Gaab, Kimberly

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bertao, Anthony

Hendrix, Tyson

Madrigal, Lizet

Filek, Joseph

Ramirez, Jorge

Perez, Joseph Samuel

Gonzalez, Armando

Andrade, Jose

Harris, David, JR

Garcia, Gabriel

Leathers, Mary

Harris, Shelby

Phillipson, Tom

Leathers, Michael, JR

Lancaster, Renee

Robinson, Sue

Leathers, Michael, SR

Fjeld, Shawn

Defendants

Hines Growers, Inc., a Delaware corporation

Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jones, Andrew B.

Defendant Attorney

Savion, Jennifer E.

 

Court Documents

Order filed

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Order on Request for pretrial discovery conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Case Management Conference

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: POS on Def Hines Growers, Inc.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Continued Case Management Conference

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of change of attorney

Answer Filed

Answer to Complaint.pdf; Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

Proof of Service

Robinson POS.pdf; Comment: of Notice of Appearance of Attorneys for Defendants

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Proof of Service

ROBINSON pos.pdf

Notice Filed

Robinson Notice of Appearance.pdf; Comment: of Appearance of Attorney for Defendants

Answer Filed

Answer to Complaint.pdf; Comment: Answer to Complaint for Damages

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Status Conference

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Robinson Summons

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Pos on Def Color Spot Nurseries, Inc.

Case Management Statement Filed

Defendants CMS .pdf; Comment: Defendants' Case Management Statement

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • Bankruptcy Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Cullers, Mark; Hearing Time: 8:33 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Motion - Withdrawal of Attorney- Judicial Officer: Gaab, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Comment: Dan Kopfman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Bankruptcy Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Bankruptcy Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:33 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Bankruptcy Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Pebet, Noelle; Hearing Time: 8:33 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: attached with certificate of mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Bankruptcy Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:33 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Hines Growers, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Hines Growers, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial: Hines Growers, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial info for Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-04690 Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial info for Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Financial: Color Spot Nurseries, Inc., a Delaware corporation; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial info for Robinson, Sue: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-29300 Robinson, Sue $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial info for Robinson, Sue: Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Financial: Robinson, Sue; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.