This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 11:37:22 (UTC).

Stephen Sacks vs. Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc

Case Summary

On 11/04/2016 Stephen Sacks filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2525

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sacks, Stephen

Johnson, Valerie

Defendant

Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sacks, Stephen; Johnson, Valerie; Awarded Against:; Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc; Amount; Damages: $4,080.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $4170.00; Comment: Payments are to be made at the rate of: $500 Per Month, beginning on July 1, 2017, and on the first day of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Party Names: Sacks, Stephen; Johnson, Valerie; Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: AMENDED (with clerk's certificate of mailing)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Request Filed

Request Filed; Comment: Continued hearing

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Plaintiff's Claim filed

Plaintiff's Claim filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Judge, Pro Tempore; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; Sacks, Stephen; Johnson, Valerie; Awarded Against:; Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc; Amount; Damages: $4,080.00; Costs: $90.00; Total: $4170.00; Comment: Payments are to be made at the rate of: $500 Per Month, beginning on July 1, 2017, and on the first day of each month thereafter until paid in full. If any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immediately.; Party Names: Sacks, Stephen; Johnson, Valerie; Hank Nishimoto-Nishimoto's Hybrids, etc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Case Status Review- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: AMENDED (with clerk's certificate of mailing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request Filed- Request Filed; Comment: Continued hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Case Status Review- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Clerks certificate of mailing attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order SC- Comment: Fee $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Cause Of Action- Action Plaintiff's Claim ; File Date: 11/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Plaintiff's claim mailed certified mail- Comment: Tracking number:7012 3460 0002 5285 9169

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim filed- Plaintiff's Claim filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for Sacks, Stephen: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2017-00010251 Sacks, Stephen $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Financial info for Sacks, Stephen: Transaction Assessment $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Financial info for Sacks, Stephen: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00037051 Sacks, Stephen $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Financial info for Sacks, Stephen: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Financial: Sacks, Stephen; Total Financial Assessment $93.00; Total Payments and Credits $93.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.