This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 15:07:08 (UTC).

Stephanie Gaona vs Arthur Gaona

Case Summary

On 06/13/2018 Stephanie Gaona filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Arthur Gaona. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Gamoian, Lisa, Guerra, Amy and Kalemkarian, David. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3455

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Gamoian, Lisa

Guerra, Amy

Kalemkarian, David

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gaona, Stephanie

Respondent

Gaona, Arthur

Minors

Gaona, Ariana A.

Gaona, Arthur J.

Gaona, Aliyah D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Guerra, Amy; Judgment Type: Order Terminating Family Law Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: Gamoian, Lisa; Judgment Type: Restraining Order after Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: HRG: 6/18/2019 Judicial Officer: D. Kalemkarian Dept: 202 Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: Not Reported Time: 0830 am Petitioner not present Respondent not present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 6/30/20 Time: 1030 a.m Dept: 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Order Terminating FL Restraining Order- Judicial Officer: Guerra, Amy; Comment: The protective order issued on 09/06/2018, restraining Arthur Gaona born on 08/16/1982 and listing as protected person(s) Stephanie Gaona, Ariana Gaona, Aliyah Gaona, Arthur Gaona is terminated. This order supersedes all other court order in this case. 5/10/2019 /s/ Judge Guerra

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Judge Guerra minute order. See attached.- Comment: Dept: 204 Time: 10:28 a.m. Judge: A. Guerra Clerk: V. Carbajal Reporter: M. Anthony Petitioner: Present / ProPer Respondent: Not Present Hearing Type: Notice of Motion, Other: DV TRO, Dismiss R.O./Drop it Other: Petitioner states she is still seeking to dismiss the Restraining Order. Petitioner states she has spoken with a DV Victim Advocate. The court grants the request to dismiss the restraining order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Motion Hearing- Judicial Officer: Guerra, Amy; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Dissmiss Restraining Order/Drop it; Parties Present- Petitioner: Gaona, Stephanie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • OSC/Motions filed

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • Initial OSC/Motion - Re: Custody/Visitation & Child Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Financial info for Gaona, Stephanie: Fee Waiver $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Financial info for Gaona, Stephanie: Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Financial info for Gaona, Stephanie: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Financial: Gaona, Stephanie; Total Financial Assessment $525.00; Total Payments and Credits $525.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.