This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/12/2018 at 18:55:15 (UTC).

State of California vs.Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/24/2016 State of California filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2101

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of California

acting by and through the State Public Works Board

Defendants

Crown Castle GT Company LLC, A Delaware limited liability company

Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation

Verus Management One, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Company

AT&T Mobility LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

NCWPCS MPL 22-Year Sites Tower Holdings, LLC

Doe 4

Global Signal Acquisitions IV LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

CCATT LLC

Crown Castle GT Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law, Samuel

Defendant Attorneys

Block, Glenn L

Kreditor, Eoin L.

Berwanger, Charles V.

 

Court Documents

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Plaintiff State of CA

Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Opposition; Comment: Forwarded (on 5/16/17) to Dept. 403

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: to amend regarding Confidential Information

Case Management Statement Filed

2016-10-06 S-CMC Statement_Verus.pdf

Answer Filed

P MCF-CHSRA - MCF's answer.pdf; Comment: to Complaint.

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) Forwarded to Dept: 403 on 4/18/2017 Order for: STIPULATION TO FINALIZE JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION AS TO DEFENDANT MORDERN CUSTOM FABRICATION, INC. ONLY

Notice Filed

Request; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR EXCHANGE (Code Civ. Proc., 1258.210)

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Trial continued to: Jury Trial to 2/11/2019 @ 9 am in Dept 501 TRR to 2/8/2019 at 9:30 am in Dept 501 MSC to 1/16/2019 at 1:30 pm in Room 575 signed by Judge Culver Kapetan

Notice Filed

Notice of Entry of Order; Comment: of entry of order

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT AND DECLARATION REGARDING SUMMARY OF THE BASIS FOR THE APPRAISAL (Code Civ. Proc., 1255.020)

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON MODERN CUSTOM FABRICATION INC, A CALIF CORP

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: ***Judgment signed forwarded to clerk's office for further processing*** Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: Stipulation and protective Order regarding confidential information

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - No Fee

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: (Order signed) Forwarded to: Dept. 403 order for: protective order RE: confidential information

Order Received for Signature

XP MCF-CHSRA - Order of Possession.pdf; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to clerks office for further processing) PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept: 403 Order of Possession

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment After Court Trial; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: State of California; Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; State of California; Awarded Against:; Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation; Status: Granted; Status Date: 09/26/2016; Status Comment: Judgment in Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: State of California; Modern Custom Fabrication Inc, a California Corporation; Verus Management One, LLC, a Delaware limited liability Company; AT&T Mobility LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; NCWPCS MPL 22-Year Sites Tower Holdings, LLC; CCATT LLC; Global Signal Acquisitions IV LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; AT&T Mobility LLC, a Delaware limited liability company; NCWPCS MPL 22-Year Sites Tower Holdings, LLC; CCATT LLC; Global Signal Acquisitions IV LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company; Awarded Against:; State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment; Comment: Requested by both parties with estimated time of 5-10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service- Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Received- Judgment; Comment: ***Judgment signed forwarded to clerk's office for further processing*** Forwarded to: Dept. 403 Order for: JUDGMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Filed- Stipulation; Comment: for judgment in condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00031481 Sacramento Legal Support, Inc. $12.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Transaction Assessment $12.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Transaction Assessment $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00023162 Eddings Attorney Support SVCS, Inc. $28.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Transaction Assessment $28.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Government Exemption Claimed $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Financial info for State of California: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • Financial: State of California; Total Financial Assessment $826.00; Total Payments and Credits $826.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.