This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/08/2018 at 02:23:05 (UTC).

XXXXX

Case Summary

On 05/19/2014 XXXXX was filed as a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Culver Kapetan, Kristi, Black, Donald, Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1444

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

Black, Donald

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

State of California Public Works Board

Yip, Lambo

Defendant and Claimant

City of Fresno

Defendants, Claimants and Plaintiffs

Acrew Management LLC

County of Fresno

City of Fresno

Owest Communications Company LLC

Sprint Communications LP

Level 3 Communications LLC

Wiltel Communications LLC

Doe 1

Yip, Lambo

Li, Huizhong

The State of California, acting by and through the public works board

Century Link Communications, LLC FKA

Yip, Lily

Cross Plaintiff

Acrew Management LLC, a California limited liability Company

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Yip, Lambo

Yip, Lily

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mallory, Rhonda L

California Dot 4050 Taylor Street

San Diego, CA 92110

Fridell, Scott R

Claimant Attorney

Badhesha, Raj Singh

Defendant Attorneys

Kroetch, James E.

Farano, Charles M.

Merat, Evan A

Jorgensen, Kenneth J.

Hall, Christopher S.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: State of California Public Works Board; Acrew Management LLC; County of Fresno; City of Fresno; Century Link Communications, LLC FKA; Sprint Communications LP; Level 3 Communications LLC; Wiltel Communications LLC; City of Fresno; Smith, M. Bruce; Snauffer, Mark W; Yip, Lambo; Yip, Lily; Yip, Lambo; Yip, Lily; Acrew Management LLC, a California limited liability Company; Yip, Lambo; The State of California, acting by and through the public works board; County of Fresno; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; State of California Public Works Board; Awarded Against:; Acrew Management LLC; County of Fresno; City of Fresno

Judgment Received

Judgment; Comment: Judgment signed forwarded to clerks offcice for further processing PENDING REVIEW Forwarded to Dept. 501 Judgment in Condemnation

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Fridell re Kroetch Opinion

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: of Notice of Unavailability

Substitution of Attorney Filed

Substitution of Attorney; Comment: Old Attorney: Charles D. Cummings New Attorney: Pro Per

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment; Comment: Settlement Conference Minute Order with clerks certificate of mailing

List filed

List filed; Comment: Expert Witness List

Amended Document Filed

Civil Document; Comment: MPA in support of ruling on issue affecting the determination of compensation re: whether an effective agreement exists regarding transfer of possession

Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed

Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Kyle Roberson

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Certification of Property Taxes Due

Trial brief filed

doc00689420160823121417.pdf; Comment: regarding precondemnation damages

Motion filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: notice of demurrer on cross- complaint

Motion in Limine filed

Motion (No Fee); Comment: re: entitlement to precondemnation damages(7 of 9)

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: list of expert witnesses

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Monica January

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Stipulated Judgment Entered; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Stipulated Judgment Entered; Party Names: State of California Public Works Board; Acrew Management LLC; County of Fresno; City of Fresno; Century Link Communications, LLC FKA; Sprint Communications LP; Level 3 Communications LLC; Wiltel Communications LLC; City of Fresno; Smith, M. Bruce; Snauffer, Mark W; Yip, Lambo; Yip, Lily; Yip, Lambo; Yip, Lily; Acrew Management LLC, a California limited liability Company; Yip, Lambo; The State of California, acting by and through the public works board; County of Fresno; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To:; State of California Public Works Board; Awarded Against:; Acrew Management LLC; County of Fresno; City of Fresno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Yip, Lily; Acrew Management LLC, a California limited liability Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Yip, Lambo; Acrew Management LLC, a California limited liability Company; Comment: Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Yip, Lambo; Yip, Lily; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Yip, Lambo; The State of California, acting by and through the public works board; County of Fresno; Comment: Without Prejudice 2nd Cross Complaint filed on 7/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Sprint Communications LP; Comment: without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order filed- Civil Document; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: of condemnation and withdrawal of lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Proposed Order; Comment: Order signed forwarded to clerks office for further processing. Forwarded to: Dept. 501 Order for: Final Order of Condemnation and Withdrawal of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment in Full filed- Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Full; Comment: Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acrew Management

    Read MoreRead Less
267 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Transaction Assessment $58.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Government Exemption Claimed $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Transaction Assessment $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Government Exemption Claimed $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Counter Payment Receipt # 194256 State of California Public Works Board $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Financial info for State of California Public Works Board: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • Financial: State of California Public Works Board; Total Financial Assessment $909.00; Total Payments and Credits $909.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

NNMNNNNNN—L.—\_‘L_;.—\—L_L—.\—&—\ 0O ~N= O W 0O ~N-~ O

E-FILED 9/8/2016

DANIEL C. CEDERBORG — SBN 124260 FRESNO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT County Counsel By: C. Cogburn, Deputy

Kyle R. Roberson — SBN 285735 Deputy County Counsel

FRESNO COUNTY COUNSEL

2220 Tulare Street, S5th Floor

Fresno, California 93721

kroberson@co.fresno.ca.us

Telephone: (559) 600-3479 Facsimile: (559) 600-3480

Attorneys for Defendant COUNTY OF FRESNO Exempt From Filing Fees Pursuant To Government Code Section 6103

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF FRESNO

CENTRAL DIVISION

THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, acting by | Case No. 14 CE CG 01444 and through the State Public Works Board,

DEFENDANT COUNTY OF FRESNO’S

Plaintiff, NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LAMBO YIP

vs. (Code Civ. Proc. §§ 435(c); 436(b)) ACREW MANAGEMENT LLC, et al., DATE: November 17, 2016 TIME: 3:30 pm

Defendants. | DEPT: 501 JUDGE: Hon. Mark W. Snauffer

Trial Date: July 11, 2016

TO ALL PARTIES AND THEIR ATTORNEYS OF RECORD:

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that on November 17, 2016, at 3:30 p.m. in Department 501 of the above-entitled Court, located at 1130 O Street, Fresno, California, Defendant COUNTY OF FRESNO (“County”) will move this Court for an Order striking the entire Cross-Complaint filed by Defendant and Cross-Plaintiff Lambo Yip (“Cross-Plaintiff”) pursuant to Code Civil Procedure sections 435. The County moves to strike the entire Cross-Complaifit because it was not filed and served in conformity with the laws of this state due to Cross-Plaintiff’s failure to seek leave of court before filing the Cross-Complaint as required by Section 428.50, subdivision (¢). (Code Civ. Proc. § 436, subd. (b).)

Defendant County of Fresno’s Notice of Motion to Court Case No. 14 CE CG 01444 Strike Cross-Complaint of Lambo Yip