This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:30 (UTC).

State Farm v Rosemary Tenorio

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 State Farm filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rosemary Tenorio. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1508

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co.

Defendant

Tenorio, Rosemary

Other

Lujan, Rosemary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pleasant, Joseph M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE353083.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • Certificate of facts- Comment: Certificate of facts on unsatisfied judgment and certified copy of judgment forwarded to Reese Law Group. ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • Returned documents letter- Comment: Documents returned: Certificate of Facts ck# 13360 $51.00 Reason: Unable to process the Certificate of Facts due to the amount listed on line #3.(f) interest $41.41, Total $7,810.88, does not match the judgment. Please correct and resubmit. Date: 12/23/14 ms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE341903.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Notice of entry of judgment- Comment: Notice of entry of judgment and proof of service filed. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • Notice filed- Comment: Notice of firm address change filed. mk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Case Management Conference- Original Type: Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for cmc scheduled for 4/21/14 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2014
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Rosemary Tenorio aka Rosemary Lujan hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: default only cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • POS of summons & comp personal- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing personal service on Rosemary Tenorio aka Rosemary Lujan on 12/22/13 hf .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE323950.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MKNISPEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . mj Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less