This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:22:38 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual v Shirley Applewhite

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 State Farm Mutual filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Shirley Applewhite. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1509

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co

Defendant

Applewhite, Shirley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pleasant, Joseph M.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $633.84

Declaration Filed

Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration in support of interest.

Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6194.91

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Issued- Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: County: Fresno Amount: $6194.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration Filed; Comment: Declaration in support of interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed; Comment: Costs: $0.00 Credit: $0.00 Interest: $633.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • 60-Day Continued CMC- Original Type: 60-Day Continued CMC; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE343864.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued- Comment: Abstract of Judgment issued. lv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • Notice of entry of order- Comment: Notice of entry of order: ph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for cmc scheduled for 9/22/14 judgment entered hf.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on 8/4/14 entire action upon default of defendant Shirley Applewhite signed by Judge Ikeda and filed. Judgment entered in favor of State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co against Shirley Applewhite in the amount of: Principal: $ 5,133.71 Interest: $104.86 Attorney Fees: $0.00 Costs: $297.50 Total: $5,536.07 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice of Case Mgnt Conf- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MKNISPEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . mk Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Financial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00028394 Reese Law Group $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Financial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co: Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Financial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co: Mail Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00003944 Reese Law Group $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Financial info for State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co: Transaction Assessment $51.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Financial: State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins.Co; Total Financial Assessment $76.00; Total Payments and Credits $76.00

    Read MoreRead Less