Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/03/2018 at 11:24:12 (UTC).

Springleaf Financial vs Charlotte M. Gonzalez/CC

Case Summary

On 03/12/2013 Springleaf Financial filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Charlotte M Gonzalez/CC. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2617

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Springleaf Financial Services, Inc.

Defendants

Gonzalez, Charlotte M

Gonzalez, Charlotte M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cramer, Todd L.

4032 Bay St, Ste. A

Fremont, CA 94538

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Clerk's Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • Writ filed wholly satisfied- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, wholly satisfied. cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCE318124.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • Writ of execution issued- Comment: Writ of execution issued to the county of Alameda in the amount of $ 4,602.96 . JL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • Clerk's default judgment- Comment: Documents in support of judgment filed. Judgment entered on 7/22/13 for plaintiff Springleaf Financial Services Inc. against defendant(s) Charlotte M Gonzalez in the sum of: Principal: $3,577.91 Interest: $ 410.05 Atty Fees: $ 300.00 Costs: $ 290.00 Total: $4,577.96 hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Request to Enter Default Filed- Comment: w/judgment cs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Charoltte M Gonzalez hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Interest calculation in support of default judgment by clerk filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Cover Sheet for original contract filed. hf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • POS of summons & comp - subst.- Comment: Proof of service of summons and complaint filed showing substituted service on Mr Gonzalez, mailed on 4/5/13. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Mailing filed. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence filed. rls

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$225.00 was made on receipt CLCE301947.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Civil Complaint filed. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Complaint filed - summons issued . dlm Event: Civil complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Civil Case Cove Sheet 3.740- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Case designated as a CRC Rule 3.740 Collections Case. dlm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: dlm Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less