This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/10/2018 at 07:18:58 (UTC).

Sherry Bachman vs. ADA Compliance Solutions Inc

Case Summary

On 09/08/2015 Sherry Bachman filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADA Compliance Solutions Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y, Snauffer, Mark and Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2806

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y

Snauffer, Mark

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bachman, Sherry

Miller Clark Landscape & Nursery Company, a California Corporation

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ADA Compliance Solutions Inc

Ardent General Inc

The Kashian Group LTD, a California Corp

Miller Clark Landscape and Nursery Company, a California Corporation

ADA Compliance Solutions, Inc.

River Park Properties III

The Kashian Group, LTD

Roes 1-25

COE 1

Ardent General, Inc.

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Miller Clark Landscape & Nursery Company

ADA Compliance Solutions, Inc.

River Park Properties III

Gazebo Gardens, Inc.

Ardent General, Inc

ADA Compliance Solutions, Inc

Gazebo Gardens, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hickey, Trevor W.

Freedman, Darryl B.

O'Driscoll, Brian H.

Niemann, Anna J

Scheley, L Theodore, III

Razavi, Leyla

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Niemann, Anna J

Scheley, L Theodore, III

 

Court Documents

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: to Complaint.

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Cross Complaint Filed

Civil Document

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: of Jury Fees Collected / Sherry Bachman

Cross Complaint Filed

Civil Document; Comment: Defendant/cross-complainant Ardent General, Inc.'s cross-complaint

Answer Filed

Civil Document; Comment: Defendant Ardent General, Inc.'s answer to plaintiff's complaint.

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Summons issued and filed

Civil Document

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Cross Complaint Filed

Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

Order filed

Order filed; Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Comment: Ex Parte Amendment To Complaint To Substitute True Name For Doe Defendant

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement Filed

Deposit, payment,disbursment

Deposit, payment,disbursment; Comment: Jury Fees Posted on behalf of Miller Clark Landscape & Nursery

Answer Filed

Civil Document

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Jury Fee Deposit in the amount of $150.00 on behalf of Defendant Ardent General, Inc

Proof of Service

Proof of Service

Civil Complaint filed

Civil Document

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Jury Both; 5 to 7 day estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar; Comment: Requested by both parties with an estimated time for trial of 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Referral to ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Jury Trial Requested by Both Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Order Attachment- Minute Order Attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2016
  • Financial: ADA Compliance Solutions Inc; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-39635 Bachman, Sherry $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00002004 Hickey, Trevor W. $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00033554 Hickey, Trevor W. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00020777 Freedman $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial info for Bachman, Sherry: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Financial: Bachman, Sherry; Total Financial Assessment $665.00; Total Payments and Credits $665.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.