This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 17:04:16 (UTC).

Shelley Sierra vs Clovis Town and Country I

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 Shelley Sierra filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Clovis Town and Country I. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale and Black, Donald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1348

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Black, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Goudy, Richard

Sierra, Shelley

Burnett, Vernelda

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Wathen-Castanos, Inc.

Clovis Town and Country I, LP

Cross Plaintiffs

Discount Landscape

Fresno Plumbing

Headliner Plumbing Company

San Joaquin Stairs, Inc.

B-F Glass, Inc.

Barreto's Painting & Decorating

Kenyon Plastering, Inc.

Madera Roofing, Inc.

Bulrad Enterprises Inc.

Ohanian's Drywall, Inc.

Advanced Insulation, Inc.

Windows Plus, Inc.

Juan of A Kind Construction

Barreto, Ramon Camberos

Central Valley Overhead Door, Inc.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adelman, Fred

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Vote, Kurt F.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Clark, Lee W

Other Attorneys

Murray, Thomas J

Drolshagen, John A.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Comment: (As to Cross-Defendant, Sacramento Insulation Contractors dba Sacramento Building Products, in 1st Cross-Complaint, ONLY. Each party to bear their own costs and fees.); Party Name: Sacramento Insulation Contractors; Comment: With Prejudice

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Copy of Case Management Statement

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Summons and First Amended Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Summons and First Amended Cross-Complaint

Association of Attorney filed

Civil Document; Comment: Robert B. Lueck,#83673 ; Christopher E. Brumfiel,#214866 ; Ember J. Oparowski,#290086 Firm of Boornazian, Jensen and Garthe, APC 555 12th St., Suite 1800, Oakland, Ca 94607

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Document; Comment: as to cross complaint

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Continued OSC due to availability of Judge Ikeda

Case Management Statement Filed

Sierra 2017-06-26 CMS Kenyon for July 26.pdf; Comment: Case Management Statement

Order - Good Faith Settlement

Order - Good Faith Settlement; Judicial Officer: Black, Donald; Comment: Order determining good faith of settlement pursuant to CCP 877.6

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement

Answer Filed

Cross-Defendant Northstar Framing, Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Cross-Complaint; Comment: to First Amended Cross-Complaint

Answer Filed

Answer Filed; Comment: to first amended cross-complaint of Wathen Castanos

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal - Other filed; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other filed; Party Names: Sierra, Shelley; Burnett, Vernelda; Goudy, Richard; Goudy, Linda; Clovis Town and Country I, LP; Wathen-Castanos, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice as to the Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Burnett, Vernelda; Comment: without prejudice.; Comment: (As to Complaint filed by)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Madera Roofing, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Advanced Insulation, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to Defendant in 1st Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Juan of A Kind Construction; Comment: with prejudice.; Comment: (As to Defendant from 1st Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Ohanian's Drywall, Inc.; Rosenthal Construction; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to 1st Cross-Defendants, Rosenthal Construction and Ohanian's Drywall; Each Party to Bear Their Own Costs and Fees.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Bulrad Enterprises Inc.; Bulrad Enterprises, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Clovis Fencing; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Names: Kenyon Plastering, Inc.; Northstar Framing, Inc.; Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Fresno Plumbing & Heating, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice; Comment: (As to Cross-Defendant in 1st Cross-Complaint. Each party to bear their own costs and fees.)

    Read MoreRead Less
229 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2016
  • Financial: Kenyon Plastering, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial info for Wathen-Castanos, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00029572 Eddings Attorney Service $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial info for Wathen-Castanos, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial: Wathen-Castanos, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,000.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial info for Wathen-Castanos, Inc.: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00029571 Eddings Attorney Service $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial info for Wathen-Castanos, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Financial: Wathen-Castanos, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Financial info for Clovis Town and Country I, LP: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2015-00006091 Eddings $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Financial info for Clovis Town and Country I, LP: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Financial: Clovis Town and Country I, LP; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KENYON PLASTERING, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MURRAY, THOMAS J.