This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 01/22/2020 at 16:19:13 (UTC).

Sebastian Pruneda vs Angelina Avery

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 Sebastian Pruneda filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Angelina Avery. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Kalemkarian, David, Dalesandro, Samuel, Diaz, Monica and Pebet, Noelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3244

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

Dalesandro, Samuel

Diaz, Monica

Pebet, Noelle

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pruneda, Sebastian

Respondent

Avery, Angelina

Minor

Pruneda, Nicholas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • Hearing2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • HearingJudge Diaz minute order. See attached.- Comment: Department: 203 Judge: M. Diaz Clerk: J. Verbera Reporter: J. Magallanes Petitioner: not present Respondent: not present Hearing Type:NOM/Other: Decision on Divorce Other: Off Calendar, No appearance by either party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • HearingMotion Hearing- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Comment: Decision on divorce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingOSC/Motions filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • HearingJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L. Garvin Bailiff: A. Rivera Court Reporter: Not Reported Petitioner not present Respondent not present No appearance, clerk to re-notice status conference Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 5/13/20 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept.: 202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Hearing1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingClerk's Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingMinute Order Corrected/Amended- Comment: Corrected/Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingJudge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Dept: 203 Time: 11:01 a.m. Judge D. Kalemkarian Clerk: L. Garvin Reporter: P. Whaley Petitioner: Present/ ProPer Respondent: Present/ ProPer Hearing Type: Order to Show, Child Support Other: The parties are sworn and provide testimony. The Court makes order regarding child custody and visitation. Child Support: Monthly income factor: Petitioner's: $890.00 Respondent's: $351.00 Petitioner / Respondent ordered to provide for the child(ren)'s health insurance coverage that is available at reasonable or no cost. Petitioner / Respondent ordered to pay 50% of all necessary unreimbursed medical, dental or vision expense for the minor child(ren) per FC4063. Child Support shall be paid by wage assignment Petitioner shall pay child support of $220.00 per month, allocated: Beginning on 12/1/18 Each party to pay 50% of work/education-related child care costs DissoMaster attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingOrder to Show Cause Child Support- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Petitioner: Pruneda, Sebastian; Parties Present- Respondent: Avery, Angelina

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2018
  • HearingProof of Service of Summons- Comment: Served Respondent on 6/5/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingSummons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HearingPetition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avery, Angelina: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Avery, Angelina: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Avery, Angelina; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pruneda, Sebastian: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pruneda, Sebastian: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FinancialFinancial: Pruneda, Sebastian; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.