This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/06/2018 at 14:16:23 (UTC).

Scott Raven vs. Saint Agnes Medical

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Scott Raven filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Saint Agnes Medical. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ikeda, Dale, Snauffer, Mark and Snauffer, Mark W. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3836

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ikeda, Dale

Snauffer, Mark

Snauffer, Mark W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

Raven, Scott

Raven, Charlyse

Raven, Rynald Martin

Raven, Ryland Martin

Defendants

Saint Agnes Medical Center

Children's Hospital Central California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Cook, Russell D.

1233 W. Shaw Avenue, Ste 100

Fresno, CA 93711

Defendant Attorneys

Beltramo, Mario L., JR

Jones, Jerry D.

 

Court Documents

Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor

Petition to Compromise Claim of Minor; Comment: Hearing set for December 9, 2015 at 3:30 p.m. dept 501

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed

Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed; Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Comment: Trial continued to: JT 10/26/15 @ 9 am in Dept 501 TRR 10/23/15 @ 9:30 am in Dept 501 MSC 9/29/15 @ 10:00 am in Room 575 signed by Judge Snauffer

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: Entry of Order to Continue Trial

Dismissal Not Entered

Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Can not dismiss Judgment

Judgment

Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Party Name: Raven, Ryland Martin

Conditional Settlement Reached

Conditional Settlement Reached; Comment: Projected Completion Date: 12/1/15

Judgment

Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Raven, Ryland Martin; Comment: With Prejudice.; Comment: (As to Claims of)

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Notice Filed

Notice Filed; Comment: No action taken. Judgement previously entered.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Dismissal of Party; Judgment Type: Dismissal of Party; Party Name: Raven, Ryland Martin; Comment: With Prejudice.; Comment: (As to Claims of)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Judgment Type: Order to Compromise Claim (entire action); Party Name: Raven, Ryland Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Judgment After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Dismissal Not Entered- Dismissal Not Entered; Comment: Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Can not dismiss Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CRC225 Dismiss After Settlement- Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Remittitur from the 5th DCA Filed - Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice Filed; Comment: No action taken. Judgement previously entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Order of Dismissal of Appeal after Certification - Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Order Received for Signature- Comment: Forwarded to Dept: 501 Order for:Order Approving Compromise o Disputed Claim or Pending Action Order signed forwarded to clerks office gfor further processing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2014
  • Financial info for Raven, Charlyse: Counter Payment Receipt # 196798 Raven, Charlyse $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • Financial info for Raven, Charlyse: Transaction Assessment $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Financial info for Raven, Charlyse: Counter Payment Receipt # 192391 Raven, Charlyse $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Financial info for Raven, Charlyse: Transaction Assessment $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Financial: Raven, Charlyse; Total Financial Assessment $150.00; Total Payments and Credits $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Financial info for Raven, Scott: Counter Payment Receipt # CIVIL-2016-00030429 Sacramento Legal Support, Inc. $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Financial info for Raven, Scott: Transaction Assessment $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Raven, Scott: Counter Payment Receipt # 185103 Raven, Scott $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Raven, Scott: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Raven, Scott; Total Financial Assessment $462.00; Total Payments and Credits $462.00

    Read MoreRead Less