This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/27/2018 at 15:06:31 (UTC).

S.C. Ellis & Assoc vs Seagraves/UD/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 12/13/2011 S C Ellis Assoc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Seagraves/UD/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1452

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.C. Ellis & Associates

Defendants

Seagraves, Jordan

Bounds, Anthony

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Money damages after 1169- Comment: In accordance with order signed by Judge Gregory T Fain on 03-01/12 judgment having been previously entered pursuant to CP1169, Court orders the money damages on behalf of S.C. Ellis & Associates against Jordan Seagraves and Anthony Bounds in the sum of: Past Due Rent: $820.00 Holdover Damages: $737.91 Atty Fees: $500.00 Costs: $524.00 Total: $2581.91 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/36/19 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Parties: Plaintiff's Counsel: Gregory L. Altounian, Esq. Attorney Gregory L. Altounian sworn and testifies. Court takes Judicial Notice of the Rental Agreement;3 Day Notice; and Proof of Service of 3 day notice that are attached to the complaint are received for the purpose of this hearing. Order signed. Notice waived. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 01-MAR-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. cr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 01/25/12. Judgment for Restitution of the premises entered on 01/13/12 cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL37613.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Jordan Seagraves . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt CLCL37365.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for Service of Summons by Posting / Publication signed by Judge J. Quashnick on 12/20/11 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 15-DEC-2011 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL37294.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 13-DEC-2011 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.