This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 07:33:08 (UTC).

S.C. Ellis & Assoc. vs. Franklin/UD/JUDGMENT

Case Summary

On 05/10/2012 S C Ellis Assoc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Franklin/UD/JUDGMENT. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0514

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Clovis Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.C. Ellis & Associates

Defendant

Franklin, Jamar

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Altounian, Gregory L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 02-JUL-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Default Judgment by Court- Comment: Judgment on entire action upon default of defendant(s) Jamar Franklin signed by Judge Gregory T Fain and filed. Judgment entered in favor of S.C. Ellis & Associates against Jamar Franklin in the amount of: Past Due Rent: $433.11 Holdover Damages: $0.00 Attorney Fees: $500.00 Costs: $361.00 Total: $1294.11 lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clovis Clerk: L. Irion Reporter: 11/40/33 Nature of Hearing: Money Damages Appearing Parties: Plaintiff: Gregory L Altounian, Esq. Defendant: Not Present Money Damages See Signed Judgment Attorney Gregory L. Altounian is sworn and testifies. Court takes judicial notice of the rental agreement, 3 day notice and proof of service in the file. Order signed. Notice waived. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Money Damages- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2012
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for uddi scheduled for 06/20/12 . cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to enter default filed. Default entered as to Jamar Franklin. cm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL39227.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2012
  • App for Publication of Summons- Comment: Order for Service of Summons by Posting / Publication signed by Judge Fain on 5/14/12. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • Declaration filed- Comment: Declaration for Order to Post filed. cg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-MAY-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 10-MAY-2012 by LIRION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$240.00 was made on receipt CLCL38981.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Summons filed- Comment: Summons on Complaint filed. lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 lmi Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet lmi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: lmi Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less