This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/28/2018 at 02:29:40 (UTC).

Sarah Sharpe vs Kaiyadaye Brathwaite

Case Summary

On 12/16/2013 Sarah Sharpe filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kaiyadaye Brathwaite. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, D Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6660

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, D Tyler

 

Party Details

Other and Petitioner

Sharpe, Sarah

Fresno, CA 93704

Respondent

Brathwaite, Kaiyadaye

Minors

Sharpe, Kaleb

Sharpe, Kaiyadaye

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2015
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judicial Officer: CONVERSION, JUDGE; Judgment Type: Default Judgment MSA; Party Names: Sharpe, Sarah; Brathwaite, Kaiyadaye; Sharpe, Kaiyadaye; Sharpe, Kaleb; Comment: (Marital status ends: 6/9/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Preliminary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Disso or Legal Sep- Comment: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment- Comment: Copies of Judgment of Dissolution sent via mail to each party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: 1st flr to be filed away on 2nd flr shelf. Judgment not signed (see JRL filed 3/5/15). All documents with Judge's Return Letter sent to Petitioner via mail. 3/5/15 cv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Judge's return letter or note- Comment: Documents returned: Judgment Reason: Overall, your forms are not completed correctly. You are submitting a Stipulation for Custody/Visitation. This requires a first appearance fee from Respondent. The Marital Settlement Agreement attached to your Judgment is also missing the required language. You are missing forms FL-141, FL-192, FL-191. You may seek legal advice or visit the Court's Self-Help Center located on the 1st Floor of the Courthouse if you need assistance with the processing of your Judgment. Judge: FLEX Date: 3/5/15 cv

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: FLEX shelf for judgment review Date on shelf 1/14/2015 MG 1/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • File forwarded- Comment: File forwarded to: FLEX to review Jgmt ms 1/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • Request to Enter Default filed- Comment: Request to Enter Default filed. Default entered as to Kaiyadaye Brathwaite ms 1/13/15

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CMAINIT on 16-DEC-2013 by MSOTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Plaintiff(s)/Petitioner(s) in propria persona ms 12/16/13 Event: Pltf/Ptnr in Propria Persona

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Property Declaration- Comment: Community property ded ms 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Uniform custody juris- Comment: Filed declaration under uniform child custody jurisdiction act. Child/ren residence for past 6 months: and period of residence: ms 12/16/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$435.00 was made on receipt FLCE215892.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Summons Issued Yes __X_ No ___ ms 12/16/13 Event: Pet Disso Marr w/children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Sharpe, Sarah: Counter Payment Receipt # 215892 Sharpe, Sarah $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial info for Sharpe, Sarah: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • Financial: Sharpe, Sarah; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less