This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 06:11:14 (UTC).

Sandia Estrada vs.J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/22/2016 Sandia Estrada filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J P Morgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dalesandro, Samuel and Culver Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3092

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dalesandro, Samuel

Culver Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estrada , Sandia

Defendants

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK a New York Corporation; Larisa Ambriz, an individual; and DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Ambriz, Larissa

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharifi, Pegah

Defendant Attorney

Feldman, Renee C

 

Court Documents

Judgment

Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Estrada, Sandia; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation; Ambriz, Larissa; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all caues of action

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: to continue arbitration status conference Matter set for March 2nd, 2017 to December 7th, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 401

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: ASC set for 3/2/17 at 10am Dept. #401

Stipulation and Order filed

Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: to arbitrate and stay state court proceedings. (re-submitted to include erroneously excluded exhibits) **ASC hearing has already been set based on the order from 11/17/16**

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Case Management Conference set for January 17, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. dept 104---Case assigned to Judge Kristi Culver Kapetan for all purposes

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

Civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue; Comment: Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue

Notice Filed

Notice; Comment: Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order To Arbitrate And Stay State Court Proceedings

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing

Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Arbitrate and Stay State Court Proceedings

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comment: Corrected: Clerk makes correction to case number

Notice or Order Staying Action

Notice or Order Staying Action; Comment: for arbitration

Order Received for Signature

Stipulation and Order; Comment: (Order signed; Forwarded to TCD for further processing) Forwarded to Dept: 403 Stip. & Order to: Arbitrate and Stay State Court Proceedings

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint; Comment: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposition: Judgment- Request for Dismissal filed; Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Estrada, Sandia; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation; Ambriz, Larissa; J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.; Comment: with prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all caues of action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Arbitration Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Dalesandro, Samuel; Hearing Time: 10:03 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Stipulation & Order to Arbitrate and Stay State Court Proceedings signed on 11/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order filed- Stipulation and Order filed; Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Comment: to continue arbitration status conference Matter set for March 2nd, 2017 to December 7th, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Chambers Work- Pre- Judicial Officer: Culver Kapetan, Kristi; Hearing Time: 5:30 PM; Result: Chambers Work - Order Submitted for Consideration; Comment: for stip and order to continue arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Received for Signature- Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue; Comment: Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Case Management Conference- Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Case Stayed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Filed- Notice; Comment: Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order To Arbitrate And Stay State Court Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing- Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing; Comment: Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Arbitrate and Stay State Court Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing- Notice of Hearing; Comment: Corrected: Clerk makes correction to case number

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed- Summons; Summons issued and filed; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil case cover sheet- Civil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-06059 J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial info for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.: EFile Payment Receipt # ACCT-2016-05490 J.P.; Morgan; Chase; Bank; N.A. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial info for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Financial: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial info for Estrada , Sandia: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-42767 Estrada , Sandia $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial info for Estrada , Sandia: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Financial: Estrada , Sandia; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less