This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 02/23/2018 at 12:03:18 (UTC).

Sanadroug Hajian v Richard J Heough Jr udd

Case Summary

On 09/08/2010 Sanadroug Hajian filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Richard J Heough Jr udd. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Clovis Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fain, Gregory. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1282

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fain, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hajian, Sanadroug

Defendant

Heough, Richard, JR

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Weber, Barry E.

Defendant Attorney

Keough, Richard

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2010
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Conversion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • Writ filed satisfied poss only- Comment: Writ of execution and return filed, satisfied as to possession only. psn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt CLCL32463.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • Writ issued for restitution- Comment: Writ of execution issued pursuant to PC1169 for restitution of the premises only. PSN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Trial judgment- Comment: Court orders judgment entered for plaintiff Sanadroug Hajian against defendant Richard J Keough, Jr. in the sum of: principal: $0.00 interest: $0.00 costs: $0.00 attorney fees: $0.00 Total: $ WAIVED And for restitution of the premises located at 2730 Lind Ave. #B, Clovis, CA 93612. Order signed in open court. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Minute order Judge Fain- Comment: Minute Order from Dept.: Clov Clerk: V. Salazar Reporter: 11:21:43 Nature of Hearing: Unlawful Detainer Court Trial vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Minute order printed- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAEVNT on 20-OCT-2010 by VSALAZAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Court Trial- Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • Unlawful Detainer Dismissal- Original Type: Unlawful Detainer Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Fain, Gregory; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • Off calendar- Comment: Off calendar for UDDI scheduled for 10/13/10. case is at issue. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2010
  • Order granting waiver of fees- Comment: Order granting waiver of court fees and costs signed by V. Salazar- Clerk, Deputy filed. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Application for waiver of court fees and costs filed. vs Event: App for waiver of court fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • Answer filed- Comment: Answer to Unlawful Detainer filed Richard Keough. vs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • JBSIS: New Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Payment- Comment: A Payment of -$220.00 was made on receipt CLCL31529.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Notice of UD Dismissal Hrg- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 08-SEP-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Unlawful Detainer Complaint filed. Access to case records restricted for 60 days from date of filing pursuant to CCP 1161.2 Event: Unlawful Detainer Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Civil case cover sheet- Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Z_Conversion- Comment: Event: New Civil Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2010
  • Restricted Access Notice sent- Comment: Docket entry for the letter produced from CDAPRTY on 08-SEP-2010 by CMOLINA.

    Read MoreRead Less