This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 11/10/2019 at 14:06:30 (UTC).

Samuel Vargas vs Michelle Lopez

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 Samuel Vargas filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michelle Lopez. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, D Tyler, Kalemkarian, David and Diaz, Monica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3329

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, D Tyler

Kalemkarian, David

Diaz, Monica

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vargas, Samuel H.

Respondent

Lopez, Michelle

Minors

Vargas, Iris

Vargas, Elly

Vargas, Andy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • 2 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Tharpe, D Tyler; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • General Motion- Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Other: 2107 waiver; bifurcated judgment (or if necessary, settlement conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • OSC/Motions filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure- Comment: Preliminary & final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge Diaz minute order. See attached.- Comment: HRG: 6/17/2019 Judicial Officer: M. Diaz Dept: 203 Time: 8:48 am Clerk: J. Verbera Reporter: J. Magallanes Petitioner not present Respondent not present Hearing Type: Reissuance of OSC Off calendar. No appearance by either party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Reissuance of OSC- Original Type: Reissuance of OSC; Judicial Officer: Diaz, Monica; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: CC/CV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Judge Kalemkarian Minute Order. See Attached- Comment: Clerk: L. Garvin Court Reporter: Not Reported Bailiff: A. Rivera Petitioner not present Respondent present Continued to: Next family centered case conference Date: 6/3/20 Time: 10:30 a.m. Dept.: 202 Other: Respondent is present and has been assisted by a staff from member the Self-Help Center. Matter continued for further case status conference. Respondent to notify the opposing party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • 1 Family - Centered Status Conference- Judicial Officer: Kalemkarian, David; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard; Parties Present- Respondent: Lopez, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Judge Diaz minute order. See attached.- Comment: HRG: 5/6/2019 Judicial Officer: M. Diaz Dept: 203 Time: 9:27 am Clerk: J. Verbera Reporter: J. Magallanes Petitioner not present Respondent present pro per Hearing Type: Reissuance of OSC There is not proper proof of service in the Courts file. The Court orders a reissuance. A new Court date must be obtained from the clerk's office today. A copy of the original moving papers along with the Request and Order to Continue Hearing must be served and Extend Temporary Emergency (ex parte) Orders must be served.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Reissuance OSC/TRO- Comment: Last Hearing: 05/06/2019 Reissued Hearing to: 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • Documents sent to- Comment: tro review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Summons issued and filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Petition for Dissolution with Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial info for Lopez, Michelle: Fee Waiver $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial info for Lopez, Michelle: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Financial: Lopez, Michelle; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Financial info for Vargas, Samuel H.: Counter Payment Receipt # FAM-2018-00008058 Vargas, Samuel H. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Financial info for Vargas, Samuel H.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Financial: Vargas, Samuel H.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.