This case was last updated from Fresno County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 09:25:22 (UTC).

Sam Miranda vs. Lion Raisins, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 Sam Miranda filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Lion Raisins, Inc. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts, Bf Sisk Courthouse located in Fresno, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Simpson, Alan, Dalesandro, Samuel, Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. and Snauffer, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3369

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Fresno County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bf Sisk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Fresno, California

Judge Details

Judges

Simpson, Alan

Dalesandro, Samuel

Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.

Snauffer, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miranda, Sam

Defendant

Lion Raisins, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Otkupman, Roman

Defendant Attorney

RICKELMAN, KEITH C

 

Court Documents

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Alan Torosian in Support of Defendant Lion Raisins, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed

Request

Amended Document Filed

Amended Document Filed; Comment: Amended Proof of Service for Motion to Compel Further Responses

Order Received for Signature

Proposed Order; Comment: Proposed Order

Motion filed

Motion; Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Supplemental Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One

ADR Stipulation Mediation filed

Stipulation; Comment: Parties to engage in mediation. Mediator: Nikolas Dibiaso

Minute Order Attachment

Minute Order Attachment

Answer Filed

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance Fee; Comment: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Summons issued and filed

Summons; Summons issued and filed

Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review

Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Ismael Orozco In Support of Defendant Lion Raisins, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Robert Fernandez In Support of Defendant Lion Raisins, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

Notice of Change of Address Filed

Notice of Change of Address

Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)

Civil Document; Comment: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing attached.

Declaration Filed

Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Roman Otkupman in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Supplemental Resposnes

Statement filed

Separate Statement; Comment: Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set One

Proof of Service

Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

Civil Complaint filed

Complaint

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment- Judgment Type: Request for Dismissal filed; Party Names: Miranda, Sam; Lion Raisins, Inc.; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Jury Trial- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Requested by both with an estimated time of 5-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Trial Readiness- Judicial Officer: Snauffer, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference- Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Summary Judgment- Judicial Officer: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y.; Hearing Time: 3:27 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissed; Comment: Keith Rickelman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review- Request for Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement filed- Statement; Comment: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Keith C. Rickelman In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Ismael Orozco In Support of Defendant Lion Raisins, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Filed- Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Robert Fernandez In Support of Defendant Lion Raisins, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Lion Raisins, Inc.: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-53535 Lion Raisins, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial info for Lion Raisins, Inc.: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial: Lion Raisins, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $1,085.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,085.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-11432 Miranda, Sam $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2017-05791 Miranda, Sam $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: EFile Payment Receipt # WEB-2016-47483 Miranda, Sam $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial info for Miranda, Sam: Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Financial: Miranda, Sam; Total Financial Assessment $645.00; Total Payments and Credits $645.00

    Read MoreRead Less